RI S0278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/11/2019)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/11/2019)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a tax payment shall be paid by midnight on the date in which the tax becomes due and payable, and reduces the amount of penalty for taxes unpaid from a maximum of twenty-one percent (21%) to ten percent (10%).
Title
State Tax Officials -- Sales And Use Taxes -- Enforcement And Collection
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0278.pdf |