RI S0291 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pharmacies display warning notice regarding use of opioids/schedule II controlled substances compiled by DOH relating to overuse/misuse/mixing with other drugs/alcohol effective 9/1/19.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Pharmacies approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Pharmacies approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2019-06-21 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |