RI S0292 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Honorable Carol Ann Conboy to join Jason M. Andrew and Gina A. Bencivenga in marriage on or about March 7, 2015, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-06SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2015-02-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2015-02-26HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2015-02-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (02/26/2015)
2015-02-24HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2015-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015)
2015-02-12HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2015-02-12SenateSenate read and passed
2015-02-12SenateRecommended for Immediate Consideration

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback