RI S0292 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the department of business regulation administer alcoholic server training programs rather than the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2017-06-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-14HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2017-06-09HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017)
2017-05-16HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2017-05-12HouseScheduled for consideration (05/16/2017)
2017-05-04HouseReferred to House Corporations
2017-05-03SenateSenate read and passed
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/03/2017)
2017-04-26SenateCommittee recommends passage
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for consideration (04/26/2017)
2017-03-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017)
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback