RI S0301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes hospital medical staff to elect whether or not to participate in a maintenance of certification program, to elect medical specialty board to implement the program and prohibits insurers from denying reimbursement based solely on this election.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |