RI S0302 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows those individuals who do not otherwise meet the requirements, to reside in an Alzheimer's special care unit or program.
Title
Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |