RI S0307 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospital to incorporate consent for peer recovery specialist services into comprehensive patient consent form. Creates MAT program using meds and counseling and to create a comprehensive approach to the treatment of substance use disorders.
Title
Comprehensive Discharge Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |