RI S0309 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds six members to the commission on traumatic brain injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traumatic Brain Injuries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-27HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar
2019-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-05-29HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-05-28SenateSenate read and passed
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/28/2019)
2019-05-21SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for consideration (05/21/2019)
2019-04-23SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019)
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback