RI S0310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Adoption Of The State Plan On Alzheimer's Disease And Related Disorders
Title
Joint Resolution Adoption Of The State Plan On Alzheimer's Disease And Related Disorders
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0310.pdf |