RI S0315 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Statute of limitation for childhood sex abuse claims extended to 35 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Causes Of Action

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-01HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-14HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-13SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-10SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-05-29SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2019)
2019-03-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019)
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback