RI S0334 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any use of a premises for marijuana cultivation be disclosed in any real estate transaction.
Title
Real Estate Sales Disclosures
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Real estate sales disclosures approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Real estate sales disclosures approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |