RI S0342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all candidates for United States President and Vice President file copies of their last five (5) years of federal income tax returns with the state board of elections.
Title
Presidential Candidates
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Presidential candidates approval of amendment (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |