RI S0365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes the owner of any vehicle not inspected as required by ยงยง 31-38-3 or 31-38-4 responsible for any fines or penalties imposed as a result of non-inspection and would prohibit any law enforcement officer from citing the operator of said vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-02-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019)
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback