RI S0366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Exposed To Violence, And Report Back By February 7, 2020, And Expire On May 7, 2020.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Exposed To Violence, And Report Back By February 7, 2020, And Expire On May 7, 2020.)
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0366.pdf |