RI S0369 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides health care employers with at least 18 employees, which receive certain state funding or pay an executive $1,000,000 or more annually, pay a minimum wage of $15.00.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019)
2019-03-13SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2019)
2019-03-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback