RI S0370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum weekly unemployment benefit rate to the higher of fifty-seven and one-half percent (57.5%) of the average weekly wages paid to workers in the prior calendar year or six hundred thirty-six dollars ($636) per week.
Title
Employment Security - Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Employment security - benefits approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |