RI S0395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enables Rhode Island businesses to voluntarily promulgate standards to guide its business activities in a sustainable and responsible manner, as well as metrics for assessing whether it has met its objectives.
Title
Relating To Businesses And Professions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House Committee on Small Business |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |