RI S0402 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-14 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-14 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Teachers' Retirement: would allow certain retired teachers, administrators, and retired employees of the board of regents to be employed on a temporary basis by certain educational entities, in furtherance of the federal race to the top grant
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Teachers' Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2011-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-06-07 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-18 | Committee transferred to Senate Finance | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0402.pdf |