RI S0402 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires schools to comply with recycling and composting laws and promotes food donation and local food service contracts.
Title
School Waste Recycling And Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0402.pdf |