RI S0404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (creates A Fifteen (15) Member Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study Of, And Provide Recommendations For, The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (creates A Fifteen (15) Member Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study Of, And Provide Recommendations For, The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseReferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2019-04-30SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/30/2019)
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-03-20SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback