RI S0405 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Defines the term "farm products" for the purposes of enforcement and regulation of the agricultural functions of the department of environmental management.
Title
Agricultural Functions Of Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Agricultural functions of dem (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |