RI S0407 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental management and the state fire marshal to regulate mining and blasting near residential areas and schools.
Title
Residential Mining Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Approval of amendment lc 01360/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |