RI S0409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires private/public schools provide/maintain opioid antagonists on-site including elementary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-28HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-25SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019)
2019-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-18SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback