RI S0423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the retirement benefits of state employees who were eligible to retire by reason of age on 6/30/12. Exempts these employees from the 401(a) plan, and returns them to the traditional defined benefit plan.
Title
Retirement System -- Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0423.pdf |