RI S0431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all defined pension plans not covered by ERISA having 200 or more members comply with ERISA's annual reporting provisions, excluding government plans.
Title
Non-erisa Covered Pension Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Non-erisa covered pension plans approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Non-erisa covered pension plans approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |