RI S0433 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Protects seniors and qualified disabled adults from financial exploitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior Savings Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-25HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-06-22HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-21HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-06-20SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-17SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-05-21SenateCommittee heard and continued
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback