RI S0437 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets the minimum hourly wages for employees of developmental disabilities organizations who have developmental disabilities at thirteen dollars and seventy seven cents ($13.77) with an increase to fifteen dollars ($15.00) commencing on July 1, 2020.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0437.pdf |