RI S0450 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various amendments pertaining to the duties and operations of the Central Coventry Fire District.
Title
In Amendment To The Charter Of The Central Coventry Fire District Pursuant To A Resolution Of The Board Of Directors Of The Coventry Fire District On December 27, 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Fire district approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |