RI S0454 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every health insurance contract to provide coverage for all FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, voluntary sterilization procedures, patient education and counseling as well as Medicaid coverage for a 12 month supply for Medicaid recipients.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0454.pdf |