RI S0457 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates public funding for legislative candidates, would limit contributions of public funds for all candidates for governor, statewide office holders and legislators.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0457.pdf |