RI S0468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the general assembly elections in the risk-limiting audits within the jurisdiction of the board of elections.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |