RI S0474 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local boards of canvassers to combine voting districts in special elections for approval/rejection of questions or when no officials will be elected or in primary elections only with board of election approval.
Title
Voting Districts And Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Voting districts and officials approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Voting districts and officials approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |