RI S0494 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a release by one claimant relative to claims relating to the Feld Entertainment/Ringling Brothers Circus accident of 5/4/14 would not discharge other joint tortfeasors.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions - Contribution Among Joint Tortfeasors
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |