RI S0496 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any questioning of a juvenile who is suspected of delinquent or criminal behavior, unless the parent of guardian of the juvenile is present, or unless an attorney is present or the juvenile and their parents have waived their presence.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |