RI S0503 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the effective date of Chapters 157 and 259 of the 2018 Public Laws from July 1, 2019 to July 1, 2020 in regards to Chapter 11-37.1 ("Sexual Offender Registration and Community Notification").
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2019) |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |