RI S0512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the contractual provisions contained in an otherwise expired collective bargaining agreement with certified school teachers and municipal employees would continue until a successor agreement has been reached between the parties.
Title
Arbitration -- Continuance Of Contractual Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2019) |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |