RI S0514 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a seasonal employment designation for purposes of unemployment benefits, which would allow employers hiring employees for less than twenty (20) weeks to apply for a seasonal determination by the director of the department of labor and training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Security - Seasonal Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback