RI S0517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the lending or borrowing of money or receipt of credit by delinquent licensees among manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers of alcoholic beverages as regulated by the department of business regulation (DBR).
Title
Lending Or Borrowing Money Or Receipt Of Credit By Licensees
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2019) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0517.pdf |