RI S0518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows license holders to restrict any patron who has not reached his or her twenty first birthday from entering the licensed establishment after ten o'clock (10:00) pm.
Title
Regulation Of Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Regulation of sales approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Regulation of sales approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2019) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |