RI S0541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the council on elementary and secondary education to waive certain provisions of the laws on elementary and secondary education for public schools but would prohibit the waiver of other listed provisions.
Title
State Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0541.pdf |