RI S0547 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the commissioner of elementary and secondary education would be appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate. The commissioner of elementary and secondary education would serve at the pleasure of the governor.
Title
Council On Elementary And Secondary Education [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education]
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |