RI S0548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the RIDE, within the next three years, to create a plan where all RI teachers would be trained in the BEARS curriculum (BEARS training includes hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation, Heimlich maneuver, and bleeding control).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback