RI S0552 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for appliances and specified equipment purchased or installed after July 1, 2020.
Title
Establishing Appliance And Equipment Energy And Water Efficiency Standards Of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0552.pdf |