RI S0553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds pickles and relish to those foods which are permitted to be manufactured and sold as a farm home food product.
Title
Sanitation In Food Establishments
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0553.pdf |