RI S0560 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state employees who had also been a correctional officer to elect to combine their service time earned from each job, for the determination of their retirement eligibility date and calculation of retirement benefits.
Title
Retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0560.pdf |