RI S0570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Tricare to pay the healthcare services funding contributions for their contribution enrollees.
Title
The Health Care Services Funding Plan Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |