RI S0574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the multi-disciplinary maternal mortality review committee to the review of the office of state medical examiners and extend certain immunities and confidentiality agreements to multi-disciplinary teams.
Title
Office Of State Medical Examiners
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |