RI S0576 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense - Educational Assistance For Combat Veterans (would Establish Various Veteran-friendly Educational Programs In Order To Allow Service Personnel Returning From A Combat Tour To Achieve Educational Attainment In An Accelerated Manner.)
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense - Educational Assistance For Combat Veterans (would Establish Various Veteran-friendly Educational Programs In Order To Allow Service Personnel Returning From A Combat Tour To Achieve Educational Attainment In An Accelerated Manner.)
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub B |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2013-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee continued |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2013) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |