RI S0576 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides consumer protection in eye care services by developing standards and enforcement protocols related to the utilization of emergent technologies in the provision of eye care services, as well as for the delegation of eye care services by providers.
Title
The Consumer Protection In Eye Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0576.pdf |