RI S0577 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of health care facility to allow a hospital or an affiliate of a hospital to own and operate ambulatory-care facilities.
Title
Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Licensing approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Licensing approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |